U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07039
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Apostolou-Berset Holdings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • August 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • June 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • June 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Answer]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • August 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.