U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30422
  • Case Name: Matthew Roy Neer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document]
August, 2018
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduce Time]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Accept Fax]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Accept Fax or Email]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.