U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30421
  • Case Name: Chad L. Herring and Dorene L. Herring
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • September 15, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 10, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Document]
  • January 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update Claim]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Order (Generic)]
November, 2019
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Objection to Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
  • October 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • October 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • July 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2019
  • June 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Correspondence]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.