U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30426
  • Case Name: Dawn M. Greminger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income Form 122C-1]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.