U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30434
  • Case Name: Trevor R. Anderson and Khristian M. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.