U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30447
  • Case Name: Sara J. Berger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
November, 2018
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.