U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07040
  • Case Name: First National Bank of Omaha v. Klein
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 02, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.