U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30458
  • Case Name: Homer Inman McMillan, II and DeErma Ruth McMillan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
November, 2018
  • November 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Comply]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear pro hac vice]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule J]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule I]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule H]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Correspondence]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.