U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30475
  • Case Name: Christopher Heuck and Britley Heuck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • December 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Set (Reaffirmation Agreement)]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
August, 2018
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.