U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30478
  • Case Name: Johnny Z. Lawson and Christine Lawson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • July 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
May, 2020
  • May 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • May 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
June, 2019
  • June 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disapprove Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Claim]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule D]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule C]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule A/B]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • October 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Corporate Ownership Statement]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.