U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07044
  • Case Name: First National Bank of Omaha v. Pudwill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • September 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.