U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30513
  • Case Name: Kristen L Schepp and Melissa J Schepp
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 27, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
  • March 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • December 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • March 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • February 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • February 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
  • September 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • April 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustees Report]
  • March 31, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Brief]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • March 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • March 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • April 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Set(Motion)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Motion (Call Court before using)]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Misc Notice]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Correspondence]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Held]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Approve Stipulation]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.