U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30518
  • Case Name: Ronald C Hove
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 11, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Affidavit of Noncompliance]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Administrative Expenses]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Addendum to Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 12 Plan]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Schedules]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • January 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • January 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 12 Plan]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Exhibit List]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Witness List]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Application (14 day notice)]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Employ]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.