U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30547
  • Case Name: Kenneth Dale Lien
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Final Account]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
  • February 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Final Report]
  • January 27, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order (Generic)]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection to Claim]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Update Claim]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order (Generic)]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection to Claim]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Avoid Lien]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Document]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Assets]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Approve Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Settlement Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Reply]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Exhibit List]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Witness List]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Held]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Objection]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Continue Hearing]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Avoid Lien]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order to Set Hearing]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Response]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Payment Advices]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.