U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07046
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Kerr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
October, 2019
  • October 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.