U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07047
  • Case Name: Velde v. McMartin, Sr. et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • December 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (21 day objection period)]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.