U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 07-30834
  • Case Name: Sue Jade Wong
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Preserve Unadministered Asset Order]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion to Preserve Unadministered Asset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.