U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07048
  • Case Name: Woodrock, Inc. v. Edwards Gravel & Trucking, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • January 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • January 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • January 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • January 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
November, 2018
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • November 07, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.