U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07049
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Section 27 Processing, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • December 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • February 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Returned Mail]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 05, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • November 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 23, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.