U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07051
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Secure On-Site Services USA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • November 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • November 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • November 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 08, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • October 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.