U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07050
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Sweet Crude Oilfield Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • January 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • December 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • November 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Request to Reissue Summons]
  • October 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • September 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.