U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30593
  • Case Name: Robert Kenton Thompson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Final Account]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Report of Unclaimed Funds/Funds Less Than 5.00]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approving Trustees Final Report]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Final Report]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • July 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Claim]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
March, 2019
  • March 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Correspondence]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.