U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07052
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Smith Manus
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • March 29, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • November 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
  • November 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • November 12, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • October 01, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • September 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.