U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30597
  • Case Name: Lon Clay and Kristen Clay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2019
  • January 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement Under Penalty of Perjury Concerning Payment Advices]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation Form 122A-2]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • October 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.