U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30612
  • Case Name: Kelly Anthony Glatt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(i)]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reduce Time]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case under 521(a)(1)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.