U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30619
  • Case Name: Vincent A Weltz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
January, 2019
  • January 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2018
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.