U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30620
  • Case Name: Lisa A. Lundvall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Update EOUST Stats]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Declaration About an Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Extend Time]
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.