U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30636
  • Case Name: Christen Breedlove and Erica Breedlove
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • November 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.