U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07053
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. City of St. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
January, 2019
  • January 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • October 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.