U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30678
  • Case Name: Shane J. Iljana
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2018
  • December 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Assume Lease or Executory Contract]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment of Installment Fee (Final-Chapter 7)]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Assume/Reject Lease or Executory Contract]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Relief from Stay]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.