U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-30393
  • Case Name: Anne Buchanan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.