U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07055
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Edwards
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • August 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • October 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • October 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • October 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • October 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • September 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.