U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30683
  • Case Name: Scott I. Stengrim
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.