U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07056
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Memorandum and Order]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 03, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • July 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • July 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • July 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • July 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 23, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 22, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • April 21, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
  • April 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 08, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 03, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 13, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit]
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
  • April 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • April 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Compel]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Counterclaim]
  • December 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • November 20, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.