U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 05-31470
  • Case Name: John N. Finstad and Lorie Finstad
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon completion)]
  • August 05, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Complaint]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Case Reassigned]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Drewes, Wayne [Reopen Chapter 12 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.