U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30699
  • Case Name: Nichole Ruth Helbling and Jeremy Allen Helbling
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Close Adversary Case]
June, 2019
  • June 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • April 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Extend Time]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Reply]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice of Rescheduled Mtg of Cred And Appt of New Trustee]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ahlgren, Erik A. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee Resignation and Report of No Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Complaint]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.