U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07057
  • Case Name: Doeling v. Greff
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 23, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 02, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • March 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • March 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 03, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • February 05, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • October 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Trial]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • September 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Continue Trial]
  • September 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • August 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Motion (14 day objection period)]
  • June 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Withdraw As Attorney]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference)]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.