U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07060
  • Case Name: Finstad et al v. Gord et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
  • November 15, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • August 05, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BAP re: Appeal]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio CD Request]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • April 24, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • April 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BAP re: Appeal]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Statement of Issues on Appeal]
  • November 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of No Transcript Ordered]
  • November 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • June 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • June 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Audio CD Request]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.