U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07059
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. CGB Enterprises, Inc., d/b/a AGRIfinancial Service
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • July 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Plaintiff]
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 10, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.