U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30733
  • Case Name: Andrew D. Stark and Mridula S. Stark
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Final Account]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Approving Trustees Final Report]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Final Report]
  • March 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Chapter 7 Final Report]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale - Text Event]
  • January 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Report of Sale]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • November 29, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 19, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reduce Time]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • November 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2021
  • March 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • March 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • February 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • August 28, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale Agreement]
  • August 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Abandonment]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Provisional Order Employing]
  • April 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Employ]
March, 2019
  • March 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Assets]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Amended Schedules]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Trustee's Initial Report - By Calendar]
  • January 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices-Joint Debtor]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Payment Advices]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Kaler, Kip M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.