U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07061
  • Case Name: Dacotah Bank v. Preskey et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • October 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
  • October 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • October 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Strike]
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 21, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Strike]
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • August 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
  • August 02, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • July 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Vacating Order]
  • July 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • July 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • July 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 24, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • June 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • June 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amend]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference)]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.