U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07062
  • Case Name: Kaler v. Vasvick
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • July 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • March 12, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • March 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Brief]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.