U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-07063
  • Case Name: Western Equipment Finance, Inc. v. Helbling
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • August 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • August 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Approve Stipulation]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Settlement Agreement]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
  • June 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • June 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • February 04, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference)]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 17, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.