U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30740
  • Case Name: Megan Lafaye Hill Barker and James Robert Joyce
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case]
  • January 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Dismiss Case (14 day notice)]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.