U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30743
  • Case Name: Jacquelyn Ganyo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Discharging Debtor - CHAPTER 7]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds-By Calendar]
January, 2019
  • January 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Filing Fee]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.