U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30752
  • Case Name: William Kenneth Reimer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Final Report]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update Claim]
  • November 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • October 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
  • September 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale - Text Event]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Administrative Expenses]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • February 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • February 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • February 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Administrative Expenses]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • November 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • August 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • June 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Correspondence]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Stipulation]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • June 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • June 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • June 04, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • June 01, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • May 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • May 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Attorney Fees]
  • May 06, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Provisional Order Employing]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • April 26, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Denial of Discharge]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Settlement Agreement]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • February 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order on Generic Motion]
  • January 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • December 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [xGeneric Motion (CALL COURT BEFORE USING)]
  • December 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • December 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2020
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • April 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Contempt]
  • March 26, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • March 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • March 18, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Contempt]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
December, 2019
  • December 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Approve Refund of Filing Fee]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Refund of Filing Fee]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • November 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • September 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • September 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Witness List]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • September 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reply]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • July 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Response]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Creditors Request for Notice]
  • July 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Turnover Property]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Report of Sale]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Convert Case 7 to 11]
  • June 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • June 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Cancelled]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Claim]
  • May 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Time]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale of Property Under Section 363 (b)]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection to Claim]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b)]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sale Agreement]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Discharge]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Financial Management Course]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Order (Generic)]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Hearing Held]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Objection]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Reduce Time]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Sell Property Free and Clear under Section 363(f)]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Extend Deadline to Object to Debtor's Discharge]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Complaint]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Brief]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Employ]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Abandonment]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Relief from Stay]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice to Creditor(s) of Amended Schedules(s)]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedule E/F]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Amended Schedules]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Additional Creditor (Fee)]
  • January 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Assets]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Update EOUST Stats]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Payment Advices]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Intent]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Schedu1es A-J]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Service]
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Doeling, Gene W [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.