U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30760
  • Case Name: Kevin L. Lomas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Simplified Application for Compensation]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Compensation - Ch 13 Simplified Application]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • October 07, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • September 08, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (21 day notice)]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • March 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 05, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
  • March 02, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Reply of No Objection]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
  • February 25, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • February 21, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 03, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Transfer of Claim with BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Transfer of Claim]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Hearing Cancelled (Confirmation)]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Withdrawal of Document (Text entry only)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing - Stipulated (Text entry only)]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • February 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Payment Advices]
  • January 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Schedu1es A-J]
  • January 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Extend Time (with 14 day Notice)]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Send Document/Notice to BNC for Service]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Misc Notice]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.