U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07001
  • Case Name: North Star Community Credit Union, a North Dakota v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Cancelled]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
  • February 26, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Voluntary Dismissal - By Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.