U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-30006
  • Case Name: Ladon Charles Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (upon dismissal)]
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Video Conference]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear by Telephone or Videoconference]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Response]
  • April 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Returned Mail]
March, 2019
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Dismiss Case (14 day notice)]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Accept Fax or Email]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order Rescheduling Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Requirement to File Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Show Cause]
February, 2019
  • February 13, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Appear pro hac vice]
  • February 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Order (Generic)]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Document]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • January 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice Re: Petition Preparers]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.