U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of North Dakota

north dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of North Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-07002
  • Case Name: Ahlgren, Trustee v. Scott Morrison in his capacity as Trustee of the M
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
  • April 17, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pay AP Filing Fee]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • January 30, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 14, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 10, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • January 09, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Documents]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • January 07, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Stipulation]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Witness List]
  • January 06, 2020: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Exhibit List]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Reply]
  • July 17, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Affidavit]
  • July 16, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Response]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order (Generic)]
  • May 20, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • May 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Correspondence]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Final Pretrial Order]
  • March 01, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Scheduling and Discovery Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Hearing Held]
  • February 13, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Pretrial Planning and Scheduling Conference]
  • February 08, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.